+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Robbins and Petersburg
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Franson
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Baker; Daudt; Torkelson; Boe; Heintzeman; Nelson, N.; Anderson; Johnson; Akland; Scott; Davids; Neu Brindley; Nash; and Theis
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Kiel
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Hertaus
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Heinrich and Jurgens
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Mueller
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Mekeland
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Division action, return to Rules and Legislative Administration
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- House rule 4.31, notice of request to return bill to the house
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Bennett and Pfarr
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Lucero
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Legislative Process Reform
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Bliss and Daniels
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor