+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832)
On March 25, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 832 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2738ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 070112299
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2007: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2007: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor