+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 1, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0692)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 692 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 31, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB978ER)
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from M. & M. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Mining and Mineral Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 989312322