+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 236 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 7, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/29/16
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1319ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1319H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16104969D-H1
- Read second time
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 16104334D