+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to secretary for record
- House concurrence received
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Adopted
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of resolutions
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
- Rules suspended
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced by senator curtis s. vanderwall
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor