+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to secretary for record
- House concurrence received
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Roll Call # 18 Yeas 88 Nays 20
- Adopted
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Energy and Technology
- Received in House
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of resolutions
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on energy and technology
- Rules suspended
- Introduced by senator john proos
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor