+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with secretary of state 3/31/2014 @ 4:15 pm
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Roll call # 154 yeas 25 nays 12 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Roll Call # 150 Yeas 77 Nays 32
- Adopted
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted and amended
- Read a second time
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Liability Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/07/2013
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted roll call # 505 yeas 26 nays 12 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate adoption
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
- Introduced by senator michael green
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor