+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0334'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 12/9/2016 @ 1:49 pm
- Approved by governor 12/8/2016 @ 9:08 am
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 11/29/2015 @ 5:02 pm
On November 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 622 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Vote reconsidered
- Roll call # 621 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 2
- House substitute h-4 concurred in
On November 10, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 508 Yeas 105 Nays 2
- Read a third time
On November 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- House substitute h-4 concurred in
On November 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-4 adopted
On September 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-4
On September 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Communications and Technology
- Read a first time
- Received on 09/07/2016
On September 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 493 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic development and international investment
- Introduced by senator rebekah warren
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor