+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0362'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 12/12/2018 @ 4:28 pm
- Approved by governor 12/12/2018 @ 12:16 pm
On December 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/5/2018 @ 9:36 am
On November 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 639 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On September 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Services
- Read a first time
- Received on 06/06/2018
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 405 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on banking and financial institutions
- Introduced by senator peter macgregor