+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Received on 12/04/2014
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 710 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with amendment(s)
- Amendment(s) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with amendment(s)
On October 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
- Introduced by senator rick jones
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor