+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 0327'20
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/29/2020 03:06 PM
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/29/2020 11:18 AM
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/22/2020 12:04 pm
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Immediate effect defeated
- Immediate effect defeated
On December 17, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 631 Yeas 85 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 9
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 2, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On October 1, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 10/01/2020
On October 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 389 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On September 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator curtis hertel, jr.