+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
- Vetoed by governor 10/27/2016
- Presented to governor 10/27/2016 @ 11:16 am
On October 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 555 yeas 34 nays 3 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute h-2 concurred in
On September 22, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 481 Yeas 61 Nays 46
- Read a third time
On September 21, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On September 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
- Read a first time
- Received on 06/08/2016
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 412 yeas 35 nays 2 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on michigan competitiveness
- Introduced by senator jim stamas