+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 12/04/2014
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 714 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3
- Substitute s-3 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3
On December 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-3
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-3
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator darwin booher
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor