+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0027'23 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 05/08/2023 11:32 am
- Filed with secretary of state 05/08/2023 01:22 pm
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 05/02/2023 01:00 pm
On April 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House amendment(s) concurred in roll call # 139 yeas 32 nays 5 excused 1 not voting 0
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Motion to discharge committee approved
- Read a second time
- Amended
- Placed on second reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 68 Yeas 86 Nays 22 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Inserted full title
- Returned to Senate
- Read a third time
On April 25, 2023 in the House:
- Notice given to discharge committee
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
On April 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-2) as amended
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-2) and amendment(s)
- Substitute (s-2) as amended concurred in
- Passed roll call # 132 yeas 33 nays 4 excused 1 not voting 0
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
On April 20, 2023 in the House:
- Received on 04/20/2023
On April 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of general orders
- Discharge committee approved
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance, insurance, and consumer protection
- Introduced by senator joseph bellino
+ − Sponsors (10)
Joseph N. Bellino Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor