+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 30, 2016 in the House:
- PRESENTED TO GOVERNOR 12/28/2016 @ 3:16 PM 12/30/16 ADDENDA
On December 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 842 yeas 26 nays 11 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 732 Yeas 62 Nays 46
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted and amended
- Read a second time
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On September 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Received on 09/08/2016
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 506 yeas 26 nays 11 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On July 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on oversight
- Introduced by senator jim stamas
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor