+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0379'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 12/19/2018 @ 2:24 pm
- Approved by governor 12/19/2018 @ 12:47 pm
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/14/2018 @ 2:16 pm
On December 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On December 6, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 728 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On September 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Received on 09/27/2018
On September 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 584 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
- Introduced by senator peter macgregor
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor