+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0126'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 07/01/2020 01:46 pm
- Approved by governor 07/01/2020 10:58 am
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 06/30/2020 11:23 am
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call: roll call # 253 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-5) concurred in
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 262 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-5) adopted
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Per Rule 41 referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 06/10/2020
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 168 yeas 37 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-2)
- Substitute (s-2) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-2)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-2)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-2)
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator aric nesbitt
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor