+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read a first time
- Received on 03/24/2022
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 107 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education and career readiness
- Introduced by senator rosemary bayer
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor