+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Received on 06/09/2016
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 462 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1 as amended
- Substitute s-1 as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1 and amendment(s)
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on michigan competitiveness
- Introduced by senator john proos
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor