+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 30, 2016 in the House:
- PRESENTED TO GOVERNOR 1/3/2017 @ 12:24 PM 12/30/16 ADDENDA
On December 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Immediate effect defeated
- House amendment(s) concurred in roll call # 810 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed Roll Call # 698 Yeas 105 Nays 2
- Read a third time
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Read a second time
On December 6, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On November 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Received on 10/20/2016
On October 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 607 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
- Introduced by senator rick jones
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor