+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 0325'20 WITH IMMEDIATE EFFECT
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/29/2020 11:14 AM
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/29/2020 03:02 PM
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/21/2020 12:54 pm
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House amendment(s) concurred in roll call # 627 yeas 35 nays 2 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 17, 2020 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Rule suspended
- Motion to discharge committee approved
- Placed on second reading
- Amended
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 630 Yeas 95 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 9
- Inserted full title
On December 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On September 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read a first time
On September 2, 2020 in the House:
- Received on 09/02/2020
On September 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 272 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
- Introduced by senator ed mcbroom
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor