+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0289'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 10/4/2016 @ 2:44 pm
- Approved by governor 10/4/2016 @ 1:44 pm
- Presented to governor 9/28/2016 @ 2:42 pm
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 513 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 1
- House substitute h-2 concurred in
On September 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 442 Yeas 106 Nays 0
- Amended
- Read a third time
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Received on 10/07/2015
On October 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 410 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On October 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-7
- Substitute s-7 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-7
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-7
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator tonya schuitmaker
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor