+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- PRESENTED TO GOVERNOR 12/27/2016 @ 2:20 PM
On December 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Immediate effect defeated
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed Roll Call # 705 Yeas 106 Nays 2
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 6, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On October 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Received on 10/18/2016
On October 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 540 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on commerce
- Introduced by senator thomas casperson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor