+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0316'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 11/3/2016 @ 11:20 am
- Approved by governor 11/2/2016 @ 3:18 pm
- Presented to governor 10/27/2016 @ 11:10 am
On October 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On September 22, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 499 Yeas 86 Nays 21
- Read a third time
On September 21, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Energy Policy
- Read a first time
- Received on 06/09/2016
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 451 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on natural resources
- Introduced by senator thomas casperson
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor