+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0268'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 7/2/2014 @ 11:19 am
- Approved by governor 6/26/2014 @ 11:28 am
- Presented to governor 6/24/2014 @ 11:26 am
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 477 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
- House inserted full title
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 398 Yeas 110 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/21/2014
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 308 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on reforms, restructuring and reinventing
- Introduced by senator jack brandenburg
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor