+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 0347'20
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/30/2020 01:14 PM
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/30/2020 10:18 AM
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/22/2020 04:25 pm
On December 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Immediate effect defeated
- Roll call: roll call # 569 yeas 37 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-2) concurred in
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 541 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a third time
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Placed on third reading
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-1)
On July 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 07/21/2020
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 241 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On April 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator kimberly a. lasata
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor