+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0161'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 6/11/2014 @ 4:14 pm
- Approved by governor 6/11/2014 @ 10:55 am
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/4/2014 @ 11:43 am
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House inserted full title
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 319 Yeas 86 Nays 24
- Read a third time
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/08/2014
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 253 yeas 33 nays 5 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3
- Substitute s-3 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-3
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-3
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator roger kahn
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor