+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 0451'14 WITH IMMEDIATE EFFECT
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 1/2/2015 @ 2:52 PM
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/31/2014 @ 4:28 PM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/26/2014 @ 10:42 am
On December 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On December 17, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 698 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On December 16, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 2, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 09/24/2014
On September 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 565 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On September 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator mike nofs