+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 328'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 7/2/2018 @ 1:06 pm
- Approved by governor 6/28/2018 @ 6:32 am
On July 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:38 pm
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 543 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-3 concurred in
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 485 Yeas 107 Nays 2
- Read a third time
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-3 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-3
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Liability Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/16/2018
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 299 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3
- Substitute s-3 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-3
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-3
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
- Introduced by senator john proos
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor