+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On December 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0385'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 12/18/2014 @ 4:38 pm
- Approved by governor 12/18/2014 @ 2:34 pm
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/9/2014 @ 1:16 pm
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 707 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On December 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 2, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 596 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On November 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On September 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed roll call # 370 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received on 06/04/2014
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy
- Introduced by senator vincent gregory
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor