+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0183'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 6/12/2018 @ 4:11 pm
- Filed with secretary of state 6/12/2018 @ 4:42 pm
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/8/2018 @ 10:07 am
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call # 361 yeas 34 nays 2 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
- Given immediate effect
- Full title agreed to
- Ordered enrolled
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 392 Yeas 99 Nays 10
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Received on 03/15/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 149 yeas 28 nays 7 excused 2 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) defeated
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-4
- Substitute s-4 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-4
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator david knezek
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor