+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0145'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 6/3/2014 @ 4:12 pm
- Approved by governor 6/3/2014 @ 11:06 am
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 5/28/2014 @ 2:02 pm
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House inserted full title
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 260 Yeas 108 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Received on 03/26/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 153 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on outdoor recreation and tourism
- Introduced by senator goeffrey hansen