+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/04/2018
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 255 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1 as amended
- Substitute s-1 as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1 and amendment(s)
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator michael nofs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor