+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On October 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0212'22 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 10/12/2022 09:21 am
- Approved by governor 10/11/2022 11:40 am
On October 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled out of session
- Presented to governor 10/05/2022 11:02 am
On September 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference report received in senate
On September 28, 2022 in the House:
- Sen. Jim Stamas replaced Sen. Kimberly A. LaSata as chair of conference 09/28/2022
- Sen. Curtis Hertel, Jr. replaced Sen. Jeff Irwin as conferee 09/28/2022
On September 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sen. jim stamas replaced sen. kimberly a. lasata as chair of conference committee 09/28/2022
- Senate adopted conference report with immediate effect roll call # 463 yeas 33 nays 0 excused 3 not voting 2
On September 28, 2022 in the House:
- Conference report received
- Conference report adopted Roll Call # 454 Yeas 78 Nays 26 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Re-returned to Senate
On September 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sen. curtis hertel, jr. replaced sen. jeff irwin as conferee 09/28/2022
On September 27, 2022 in the House:
- Rep. Mary Whiteford replaced Rep. Thomas Albert as conferee 09/27/2022
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to conference committee
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- House conferees named 06/21/2022: Reps. Ben Frederick Thomas A. Albert Samantha Steckloff
On May 24, 2022 in the House:
- Re-received from Senate with notice of nonconcurrence in House substitute (H-1)
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate named conferees 05/24/2022: sens. kimberly lasata, jim stamas, jeff irwin
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Defeated roll call # 264 yeas 0 nays 36 excused 2 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-1) nonconcurred in
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 230 Yeas 59 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Placed on immediate passage
- Title amended
- Returned to Senate
- Read a third time
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on second reading
- Motion to discharge committee approved
- Rule suspended
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/04/2022
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-2) as amended
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-2) and amendment(s)
- Substitute (s-2) as amended concurred in
- Amendment(s) defeated
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed roll call # 153 yeas 31 nays 4 excused 3 not voting 0
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-2)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-2)
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator kimberly a. lasata
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor