+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0091'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 4/1/2014 @ 1:48 pm
- Approved by governor 4/1/2014 @ 8:42 am
- Presented to governor 3/31/2014 @ 11:52 am
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 180 yeas 35 nays 2 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 159 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Received on 03/04/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 68 yeas 36 nays 2 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
- Introduced by senator jim ananich
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor