+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0256'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 6/28/2018 @ 2:44 pm
- Approved by governor 6/27/2018 @ 10:28 pm
On July 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:12 pm
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 536 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 456 Yeas 105 Nays 3
- Read a third time
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Received on 03/15/2018
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 158 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
- Introduced by senator marty knollenberg
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor