+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0124'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 5/3/2018 @ 11:24 am
- Approved by governor 5/2/2018 @ 8:48 pm
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 4/25/2018 @ 12:08 pm
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House amendment(s) concurred in roll call # 201 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 224 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Amended
- Placed on third reading
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Received on 03/08/2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 138 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections and government reform
- Introduced by senator david robertson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor