+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0107'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 4/5/2018 @ 3:00 pm
- Approved by governor 4/5/2018 @ 8:56 am
- Presented to governor 3/30/2018 @ 11:45 am
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Placed on messages from the Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 188 Yeas 102 Nays 6
- Read a third time
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Received on 02/20/2018
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 96 yeas 34 nays 0 excused 4 not voting 0
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator rick jones
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor