+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- PRESENTED TO GOVERNOR 1/2/2015 @ 10:16 AM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House amendment(s) concurred in roll call # 898 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 747 Yeas 103 Nays 6
On December 17, 2014 in the House:
- Postponed temporarily
- Read a third time
On December 16, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Read a second time
On December 2, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Received on 06/04/2014
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 363 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on natural resources, environment and great lakes
- Introduced by senator howard walker
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor