+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- For final disposition of budget, see hb 5313
- Conference report received in senate
- Referred to committee on appropriations
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to conference committee
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- House conferees named 05/20/2014: Reps. Matt Lori Rob VerHeulen Rashida Tlaib
- Senate conferees named 05/20/2014: Sens. John Moolenaar Roger Kahn Vincent Gregory
- Re-received from Senate with notice of nonconcurrence in House substitute H-1
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate named conferees 05/20/2014: sens. john moolenaar, roger kahn, vincent gregory
- Roll call # 280 yeas 0 nays 38 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 nonconcurred in
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Motion to discharge committee approved
- Read a second time
- Placed on second reading
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed Roll Call # 240 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Returned to Senate
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Notice given to discharge committee
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1 and amendment(s)
- Substitute s-1 as amended concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1 as amended
- Rules suspended
- Amendment(s) defeated
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed roll call # 225 yeas 32 nays 5 excused 1 not voting 0
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Received on 05/06/2014
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator john moolenaar
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor