+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 0307'20 WITH IMMEDIATE EFFECT
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/29/2020 02:26 PM
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/29/2020 10:38 AM
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/22/2020 04:23 pm
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On December 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate effect postponed
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 502 Yeas 102 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 7
- Read a third time
On July 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On October 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Received on 10/22/2019
On October 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 275 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On October 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On October 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
- Introduced by senator kimberly lasata
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor