+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0134'14 with immediate effect
- Assigned pa 0134'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 5/27/2014 @ 2:41 pm
- Approved by governor 5/27/2014 @ 11:28 am
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 5/22/2014 @ 12:58 pm
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 225 Yeas 110 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Received on 02/12/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 20 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator tonya schuitmaker
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor