+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0378'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 12/18/2018 @ 2:58 pm
- Approved by governor 12/18/2018 @ 11:47 am
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/17/2018 @ 5:20 pm
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 831 Yeas 95 Nays 14
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/27/2018
On November 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 602 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On October 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator jim stamas
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor