+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 193'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 6/20/2018 @ 1:16 pm
- Approved by governor 6/19/2018 @ 8:04 pm
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/8/2018 @ 9:49 am
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Given immediate effect
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 352 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read a first time
- Received on 02/14/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 72 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on local government
- Introduced by senator dale zorn