+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- PRESENTED TO GOVERNOR 1/2/2015 @ 9:46 AM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 865 yeas 33 nays 5 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 707 Yeas 90 Nays 19
- Amended
- Read a third time
On December 16, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
- Read a first time
- Received on 09/24/2014
On September 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 566 yeas 31 nays 7 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3
- Substitute s-3 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator judith emmons
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor