+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 0304'20 WITH IMMEDIATE EFFECT
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/29/2020 10:32 AM
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/29/2020 02:20 PM
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/22/2020 04:17 pm
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
On December 18, 2020 in the House:
- GIVEN IMMEDIATE EFFECT
On December 17, 2020 in the House:
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 587 Yeas 105 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Senate substitute (S-3) to House substitute (H-3) concurred in
On December 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote reconsidered
- Senate requests return
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Request granted
- Returned to Senate
- Re-returned from Senate with substitute (S-3) to House substitute (H-3) with title amendment
On December 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Substitute (s-3) adopted
- House substitute (h-3) concurred in as substituted (s-3)
- Passed roll call # 555 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 10, 2020 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Re-returned from Senate with substitute (S-2) to House substitute (H-3)
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Roll call: roll call # 471 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-3) concurred in as substituted (s-1)
On December 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 499 Yeas 103 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 7
- Amended
- Read a third time
- Title amended
On July 22, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Substitute (H-1) not adopted
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On October 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 272 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On October 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Received on 10/22/2019
- Read a first time
On October 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On October 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
- Introduced by senator stephanie chang
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor