+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 09/07/2016
On September 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 480 yeas 32 nays 4 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on agriculture
- Introduced by senator margaret o'brien