+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0173'22 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 07/21/2022 11:22 am
- Approved by governor 07/21/2022 09:58 am
On July 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 07/11/2022 01:58 pm
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Given immediate effect
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate effect postponed
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 78 Yeas 80 Nays 21 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Read a third time
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Received on 01/27/2022
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 12 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On November 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
- Introduced by senator jim runestad
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor