+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0115'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 4/11/2014 @ 2:49 pm
- Approved by governor 4/7/2014 @ 9:20 am
- Presented to governor 3/31/2014 @ 11:44 am
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 156 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 3 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- House inserted full title
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 137 Yeas 103 Nays 7
- Read a third time
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Received on 02/12/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 17 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On December 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on natural resources, environment and great lakes
- Introduced by senator darwin booher
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor