+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-3)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Outdoor Recreation
- Read a first time
- Received on 01/30/2020
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 32 yeas 22 nays 16 excused 0 not voting 0
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on environmental quality
- Introduced by senator roger victory
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor